Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00132-CV    
02-18-00132-CV
04/16/2018
Arbitration
Apache Corporation 
Bryan C. Wagner, Trade Exploration Corporation, Wagner & Cochran, Inc., and Wagner Oil Company 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/25/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/29/2018Submitted 
06/25/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/08/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/08/2018Motion to consolidate disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2018Case ready to be set 
06/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/10/2018Motion to consolidate filed 
05/08/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/30/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/26/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/25/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/20/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/20/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/19/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
04/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/29/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Apache CorporationAppellantJane Langdell Robinson
Robert E. Aldrich Jr.
Foster C. Johnson
Timothy C. Shelby
Trade Exploration CorporationAppelleeWilliam L. Kirkman
Scott R. Wiehle
Wagner Oil CompanyAppelleeDavid E. Keltner
Scott R. Wiehle
Leslie R. Robnett
William L. Kirkman
Wagner & Cochran, Inc.AppelleeWilliam L. Kirkman
Scott R. Wiehle
Wagner, Bryan C.AppelleeWilliam L. Kirkman
David E. Keltner
Leslie R. Robnett
Scott R. Wiehle
Trial Court Information
348th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Michael Wallach 
348-296927-17 
Court Reporter, 348th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site