Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00131-CV    
02-18-00131-CV
04/13/2018
Plea to jurisdiction
City of Fort Worth 
Shea O’Neill 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/11/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/07/2018Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/04/2018Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
08/28/2018Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/24/2018Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
07/12/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
07/11/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/22/2018Case ready to be set 
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/10/2018Docketing statement filed 
05/02/2018Notice of late docketing statement 
05/01/2018Notice of late filing fee 
04/23/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/13/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/07/2018At IssueAt issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
O'Neill, SheaAppelleeDaniel L. Bates
Matt Bachop
Patrick H. O'Neill
City of Fort WorthAppellantKelly R. Madrid
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable J. Wade Birdwell 
342-292450-17 
Court Reporter, 342nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site