Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00129-CV    
02-18-00129-CV
04/10/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of A.C., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
06/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
09/11/2018Notice received 
08/21/2018Submitted 
07/31/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/30/2018Case ready to be set 
07/27/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/18/2018Document filed 
06/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/04/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/26/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/26/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/25/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/24/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/23/2018Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/19/2018Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
04/19/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/10/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/10/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/02/2019StatusMandate to Issue
12/27/2018StatusRelease to publisher
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C., A.Civil - Ad LitemBrandy Oliphint
C., A.AppellantPaul M. Leopold
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeNatalie Barnett
S., A.AppellantAllison M. Bedore
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Parker 
Honorable Jerry Buckner 
CIV-17-0037 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 1, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site