Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00127-CV    
02-18-00127-CV
04/12/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of R.S., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/05/2018Amended brief filedAppellee
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/06/2018Appendix filedAppellant
05/24/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/05/2018Amended brief filed 
06/28/2018Corrected brief requested 
06/28/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/06/2018Appendix filed 
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/2018Corrected document requested 
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/24/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/23/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/13/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/12/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/19/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S., A.AppellantAnthony Hamilton Green
S., R.Civil - Ad LitemRay Hall
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
Shelby White
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-98278J-13 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site