Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00126-CV    
02-18-00126-CV
04/13/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Jan Mogged, James Richard Fletcher and Michael Alan Taylor 
Bobby Wayne Lindamood, Jr., and Jr's Demolition & Excavation, Inc. 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-17-00097-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/01/2017Additional authorities filedAppellee
08/28/2017Reply brief filedAppellee
08/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/10/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
06/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/14/2018Response filed 
05/08/2018Response filed 
05/07/2018Response filed 
05/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/03/2018Objection disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/2018Response filed 
04/25/2018Objection filed 
04/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
12/06/2017Response filed 
12/01/2017Additional authorities filed 
11/30/2017Submitted 
10/12/2017Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/11/2017Response filed 
10/10/2017Fee paid 
10/10/2017Motion filed 
10/02/2017Set for submission on briefs 
08/28/2017Reply brief filed 
08/09/2017Case ready to be set 
08/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/10/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/09/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/19/2017Letter filed 
04/18/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
04/13/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
04/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/03/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/21/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/21/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/20/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/08/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Taylor, Michael AlanAppellantRussell J. DePalma
Fletcher, James RichardAppellantRussell J. DePalma
Lindamood, Jr., , Bobby WayneAppelleeBruce L. James
JR's Demolition & Excavation, Inc.AppelleeBruce L. James
Mogged, JanAppellantBradley C. Poulos
Russell J. DePalma
Trial Court Information
348th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Dana M. Womack 
348-278342-15 
Court Reporter, 348th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site