Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00125-CV    
02-18-00125-CV
04/13/2018
Real Property
James Daniel Roberts and Sheryl A. Gross 
Linda Ratliff, Robert Ratliff, and Leonard Ratliff 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-17-00094-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/14/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
07/24/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/25/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
11/30/2017Submitted 
10/02/2017Set for submission on briefs 
08/14/2017Reply brief filed 
08/11/2017Notice received 
07/24/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/24/2017Case ready to be set 
06/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/19/2017Fee paid 
06/19/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/25/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/25/2017Appearance of counsel 
04/24/2017No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
04/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2017Fee paid 
04/13/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/24/2017Notice of late filing fee 
03/14/2017Docketing statement filed 
03/13/2017Amended notice of appeal filed 
03/06/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Roberts, James DanielAppellantM. Keith Ogle
Gross, Sheryl A.AppellantM. Keith Ogle
Ratliff, LeonardAppelleeShayne D. Moses
William K. Clary
David A. Palmer
Ratliff, LindaAppelleeShayne D. Moses
William K. Clary
David A. Palmer
Kingsbery, RobertAppellee 
Ratliff, RobertAppelleeShayne D. Moses
David A. Palmer
William K. Clary
Trial Court Information
271st District Court 
Wise 
Honorable John H. Fostel 
CV15-08-554 
Court Reporter, 271st District Court, Wise/Jack Counties 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site