Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00124-CV    
02-18-00124-CV
04/13/2018
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of A.E., A Child 
 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-17-00028-CV 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/17/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/09/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/19/2018Submitted 
06/28/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/28/2018Motion to recuse disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/2018Motion to recuse filed 
05/23/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
04/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
11/30/2017Submitted 
10/02/2017Set for submission on briefs 
06/30/2017Case ready to be set 
06/30/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/13/2017Fee paid 
06/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/13/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/25/2017Fee paid 
04/25/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/2017Reporters record filed 
03/03/2017Clerks record filed 
03/03/2017Supplemental clerks record filed 
02/28/2017Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/2017Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/2017Response filed 
02/27/2017Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/24/2017No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
02/24/2017Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/27/2017Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
01/27/2017Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
01/06/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/29/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/08/2018StatusRelease to publisher
10/18/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E., F.AppellantNeil L. Durrance
D., A.AppelleeMark Lewis
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable The Honorable Tiffany Haertling 
2009-21195-158 
Niki D. Hightower 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site