Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00122-CV    
02-18-00122-CV
04/13/2018
Personal Injury
P.F. and wife, J.F., as Next Friends of Their Daughter I.F. 
S.S., S.S, and S.S. 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-16-00134-CV 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/28/2017Reply brief filedAppellant
01/19/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/27/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/20/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/20/2018Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
09/05/2018Motion for en banc reconsideration filed 
09/05/2018Motion for rehearing filed 
08/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
07/19/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed/Reversed & Remanded to Trial Court
05/16/2018Submitted 
04/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
03/30/2017Submitted 
02/28/2017Reply brief filed 
02/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
02/03/2017Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/2017Fee paid 
01/26/2017Set for submission on briefs 
01/19/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/19/2017Case ready to be set 
12/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/22/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/22/2016Fee paid 
11/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
11/23/2016Fee paid 
11/23/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/27/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/13/2016Order entered 
10/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/13/2016Fee paid 
10/13/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2016Fee paid 
09/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/06/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/05/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/05/2016Fee paid 
07/28/2016Record Sent 
07/19/2016Record Sent 
07/15/2016Sealed supplemental clerks record filed 
07/15/2016Clerks record filed 
07/12/2016No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
07/07/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
06/21/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
06/21/2016Docketing statement filed 
06/09/2016Appearance of counsel 
06/08/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018StatusRelease to publisher
11/29/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
S., S.AppelleeCarlos A. Balido
Gregory R. Ave
S., S.AppelleeGregory R. Ave
Carlos A. Balido
F., J.AppellantHeather L. Long
Christopher A. Payne
Charla G. Aldous
Brent R. Walker
F., P.AppellantHeather L. Long
Brent R. Walker
Charla G. Aldous
Christopher A. Payne
Trial Court Information
442nd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Tiffany Haertling 
16-03909-442 
Niki D. Hightower 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site