Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00121-CV    
02-18-00121-CV
04/13/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Mindy M. Rice 
Natalie Fix and Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-16-00133-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/12/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/16/2018Submitted 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
09/28/2017Submitted 
07/07/2017Set for submission on briefs 
04/26/2017Case ready to be set 
04/12/2017Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/09/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/09/2017Fee paid 
02/14/2017Brief filed - oral argument requested 
01/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/12/2017Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/12/2017Fee paid 
12/01/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
12/01/2016Fee paid 
12/01/2016Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/28/2016Record Sent 
11/18/2016Reporters record filed 
10/19/2016Order entered 
10/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
09/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/19/2016Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
08/08/2016Record Sent 
08/05/2016Clerks record filed 
07/07/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/07/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
06/09/2016Docketing statement filed 
06/07/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/16/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAppelleeMichael Worthington
Rice, Mindy M.AppellantKurt Arbuckle
Fix, NatalieAppelleeDan D. McClain
Trial Court Information
367th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Margaret Barnes 
14-06112-367 
Marissa M Elliott 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site