Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00120-CV    
02-18-00120-CV
04/13/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Lutea, L.L.C. and Pharia, L.L.C. 
W.S. Draper aka Warner Draper 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-16-00131-CV 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/20/2016Reply brief filedAppellant
10/03/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
09/02/2016Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
12/29/2016Submitted 
12/14/2016Letter received 
11/04/2016Set for submission on briefs 
10/20/2016Reply brief filed 
10/03/2016Case ready to be set 
10/03/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/16/2016Record Sent 
09/02/2016Record Sent 
09/02/2016Brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/03/2016Clerks record filed 
07/20/2016Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/2016Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
07/07/2016Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
07/07/2016Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/2016Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/28/2016Docketing statement filed 
06/21/2016Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
06/20/2016Notice of late filing fee 
06/06/2016Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lutea, LLCAppellantKelly Gill
Draper, W. S.AppelleeJerry J. Jarzombek
Pharia, LLCAppellantKelly Gill
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 1 
Tarrant 
Honorable Don Pierson 
2013-005341-1-A 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 1 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site