Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00119-CV    
02-18-00119-CV
04/13/2018
Real Property
Eusebio Palacios 
Jayaben Patel 
No 
8th Court of Appeals 
04/13/2018 
08-15-00072-CV 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/16/2015Reply brief filedAppellant
11/12/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/07/2015Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/2018Remittitur 
06/07/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/07/2018Memorandum opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
05/16/2018Submitted 
04/17/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
04/16/2018Set for submission on briefs 
04/13/2018Case ready to be set 
04/13/2018Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
04/13/2018Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals 
01/25/2017Letter filed 
05/17/2016Letter filed 
03/29/2016Submitted 
01/13/2016Set for submission on briefs 
12/16/2015Reply brief filed 
12/02/2015Fee paid 
12/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
12/02/2015Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/2015Case ready to be set 
11/12/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
10/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/07/2015Order entered 
10/06/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
10/06/2015Fee paid 
09/04/2015Fee paid 
09/04/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/04/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/22/2015Fee paid 
07/22/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/22/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/07/2015Fee paid 
07/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/07/2015Brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/06/2015Letter received 
06/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/2015Fee paid 
06/05/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2015Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/07/2015Fee paid 
04/22/2015Letter received 
04/21/2015Appearance of counsel 
04/07/2015Reporters record filed 
03/16/2015Clerks record filed 
03/16/2015Letter filed 
03/12/2015Fee paid 
03/09/2015No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record 
03/09/2015No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record 
02/25/2015Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/23/2015Court fee due 
02/23/2015Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals 
02/19/2015Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
02/13/2015Motion to dismiss filed 
02/05/2015Letter issued by the court 
02/02/2015Response filed 
01/21/2015Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue 
01/20/2015Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Patel, JayabenAppelleeKunal Udeshi
Palacios, EusebioAppellantRandy Ford Taub
Stephen C. Stapleton
Trial Court Information
48th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David L. Evans 
048-262207-12 
Court Reporter, 48th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site