Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00108-CV    
02-18-00108-CV
04/02/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of C.W., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/20/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/01/2018Case ready to be set 
05/31/2018Response filed 
05/11/2018Response was not filed 
04/20/2018Anders brief filed 
04/13/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/09/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/09/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/02/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W., C.Civil - Ad LitemDeanna M. JeffersonSmith
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
W., S. AppellantS. W.
Anthony Hamilton Green
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-105491-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site