Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00107-CV    
02-18-00107-CV
04/02/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of L.W. and F.W., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/12/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
07/11/2018Submitted 
06/20/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/04/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/04/2018Supplemental reporters record due 
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/18/2018Record checked out 
05/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2018Original exhibits filed 
04/12/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/12/2018Order entered 
04/11/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/06/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/02/2018Case began in court of appeals 
04/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/2018StatusRelease to publisher
09/20/2018StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W., F.Civil - Ad LitemPatty D. Tillman
W., K.AppellantBrian J. Newman
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJacob Mitchell
Joseph W. Spence
W., L.Civil - Ad LitemPatty D. Tillman
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-106063-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site