Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00102-CV    
02-18-00102-CV
03/28/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Peterson, Goldman & Villani, Inc. 
Ancor Holdings, LP, Timothy McKibben, Joseph Randall Keene, and Ancor Partners, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/15/2018Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/2018Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
10/09/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
10/03/2018Case ready to be set 
10/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/28/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
09/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/04/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/11/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/28/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/28/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/15/2018At IssueAt issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ancor Partners, Inc.AppelleeDonald E. Herrmann
Jason C. Nash
McKibben, TimothyAppelleeJason C. Nash
Donald E. Herrmann
Ancor Holdings, LPAppelleeJason C. Nash
Donald E. Herrmann
Keene, RandallAppelleeJason C. Nash
Donald E. Herrmann
Peterson, Goldman & Villani, Inc. AppellantSteven D. Sanfelippo
Don Swaim
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John P. Chupp 
141-236257-09 
Court Reporter, 141st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site