Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00094-CV    
02-18-00094-CV
03/21/2018
Contract
MCMC Auto Ltd. 
Sidecars, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/21/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
06/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/21/2018Reply brief filed 
06/01/2018Case ready to be set 
06/01/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/25/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/20/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/17/2018Letter filed 
04/17/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/09/2018Notice of late filing fee 
04/03/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/21/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sidecars, Inc.AppelleeMark A. Weitz
MCMC auto Ltd.AppellantStacy R. Obenhaus
Craig B. Florence
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Susan H. McCoy 
153-285175-16 
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site