Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00093-CV    
02-18-00093-CV
03/20/2018
Estate Proceedings & Administration
Estate of John David Harris, Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/12/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
09/11/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
07/30/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
10/12/2018Reply brief filed 
09/28/2018Case ready to be set 
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
09/14/2018Document Received 
09/11/2018Brief was not filed 
09/11/2018Case ready to be set-withdrawn 
09/10/2018Telephone call received 
09/07/2018Notice of late brief 
08/01/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
07/30/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/27/2018Letter received 
06/29/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
06/29/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/04/2018Letter issued by the court 
06/04/2018Letter received 
04/23/2018Letter received 
04/04/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/20/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown HeirsAppelleeMonika G. Cooper
Harris, David GlenAppellantDavid Glen Harris
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Brooke Allen 
2011-PR00903-1-2 
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 2 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site