Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00091-CV    
02-18-00091-CV
03/14/2018
Contract
Sister Initiative, LLC, David Bagwell, and Susan Bagwell; AND The Stonegate Financial Corporation 
Broughton Maintenance Association, Inc., Old Grove Maintenance Association, Inc., and Whittier Heights Maintenance Association, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/06/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/30/2018Brief struckAppellant
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/19/2018Response filed 
10/18/2018Motion filed 
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/07/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
08/06/2018Reply brief filed 
07/30/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/26/2018Case ready to be set 
07/26/2018Order entered 
07/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/20/2018Response filed 
07/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/16/2018Response filed 
07/16/2018Telephone call received 
07/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/06/2018Brief filed - oral argument not requested 
07/06/2018Order entered 
06/30/2018Brief struck 
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/2018Response filed 
06/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/31/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
05/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/2018Motion disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/10/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/10/2018Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2018Response filed 
05/07/2018Response filed 
05/07/2018Response filed 
05/07/2018Mediation objection filed 
04/30/2018Reply to response or motion filed 
04/30/2018Letter filed 
04/30/2018Response filed 
04/27/2018Motion filed 
04/27/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
04/27/2018Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/25/2018Response filed 
04/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/24/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/24/2018Motion to dismiss filed 
04/24/2018Response filed 
04/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/17/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/11/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/14/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/14/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/14/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
03/14/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sister Initiative, LLCAppellantJeffrey T. Hall
Whittier Heights Maintenance Association, Inc.AppelleeBryan D. Bruner
The Stonegate Financial CorporationAppellantKevin T. Schutte
Old Grove Maintenance Association, Inc.AppelleeH. Dustin Fillmore III
Bagwell, SusanAppellantJeffrey T. Hall
Broughton Maintenance Association, Inc.AppelleeThomas R. Stauch
Bagwell, DavidAppellantJeffrey T. Hall
Trial Court Information
96th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable R. H. Wallace 
096-256351-11 
Court Reporter, 96th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site