Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00086-CV    
02-18-00086-CV
03/12/2018
Probate
Estate of Bert Hughes Gibbs, Deceased 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/10/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/13/2018Case ready to be set 
08/13/2018Letter filed 
08/10/2018Reply brief filed 
08/10/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
07/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/30/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/11/2018Document Received 
04/10/2018Clerks notice to court regarding status of record 
03/26/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/12/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gibbs, Kip HughesAppelleeJ. Jeffrey Springer
Gibbs, KennethAppelleeRickey J. Brantley
Bell, Jeri LynnAppellantTimothy E. Malone
Gibbs, Sandra FayeAppelleeJ. Jeffrey Springer
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Brooke Allen 
2005-0000126-2-C 
Court Reporter, Probate Court No. 2 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site