Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00080-CV    
02-18-00080-CV
03/05/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of G.H. and G.H., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/26/2018Amended brief filedAppellant
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/11/2018Case ready to be set 
05/11/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/26/2018Amended brief filed 
04/26/2018Corrected brief requested 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/04/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/20/2018Telephone call received 
03/13/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/09/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/08/2018Order received from trial court 
03/06/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
03/05/2018Case began in court of appeals 
03/05/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
H., G.AppellantMike Berger
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJohn E. Meskunas
Joseph W. Spence
B., K.AppellantSharon E. Giraud
H., G.Civil - Ad LitemSidney W. Shapiro
H., G.Civil - Ad LitemSidney W. Shapiro
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-103932-16 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site