Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00073-CV    
02-18-00073-CV
02/26/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of K.M., the Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/20/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/15/2018Submitted 
05/25/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/25/2018Case ready to be set 
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/22/2018Letter filed 
05/21/2018Response was not filed 
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/24/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/23/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
04/20/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
04/20/2018Anders brief filed 
04/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/08/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/28/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
02/26/2018Case began in court of appeals 
02/26/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/2018MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
06/15/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
M., K.Civil - Ad LitemPatrick A. Wright
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeCatherine Luft
Matthew J. Whitten
M., N.AppellantErin Dion
H., K. AppellantEvan R. Clift
K. H.
Trial Court Information
211th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Brody Young Shanklin 
16-02573-211 
Court Reporter, 211th District Court, Denton County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site