Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00072-CV    
02-18-00072-CV
02/26/2018
Special Appearance
American Homeowner Preservation, LLC and Jorge Newbery 
Brian J. Pirkle 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/02/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Reply brief filed 
06/26/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/14/2018Case ready to be set 
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/24/2018Letter received 
04/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/21/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
03/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/07/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/26/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
American Homeowner Preservation, LLCAppellantTate Hemingson
Pirkle, Brian J.AppelleeAlice E. Bower
Newbery, JorgeAppellantTate Hemingson
Trial Court Information
236th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Thomas Wilson Lowe, 
236-293606-17 
Court Reporter, 236th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site