Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00063-CV    
02-18-00063-CV
02/21/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of E.A., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/20/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/04/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
06/21/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/2018Motion to withdraw attorney disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/15/2018Submitted 
05/25/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/25/2018Case ready to be set 
05/25/2018Letter filed 
05/11/2018Response was not filed 
04/20/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
04/20/2018Anders brief filed 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/28/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/27/2018Docketing statement due 
02/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
02/21/2018Case began in court of appeals 
02/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file notice of appeal filed 
02/21/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/04/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
A., C. AppellantKatherine Allen
C. A.
A., E.Civil - Ad LitemBrian Simpson
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ellen S. Smith 
323-104036-16 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site