Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00061-CV    
02-18-00061-CV
02/20/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Louis Scoma, Jr. and Sue Scoma 
Colleyville Spring Garden Townhomes Residential Association, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/16/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
09/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/16/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
10/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/18/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
09/12/2018Case ready to be set 
09/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/12/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/29/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/03/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/21/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/20/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/20/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
02/20/2018Docketing statement filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Scoma, SueAppellantThomas M. Michel
Scoma, Jr., Louis AppellantThomas M. Michel
Colleyville Spring Garden Townhomes Residential Association, Inc.AppelleeRandall G. Walters
Gregory R. Ave
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jennifer A. Rymell 
2016-001611-2 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 2 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site