Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00056-CV    
02-18-00056-CV
02/14/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
George Manor 
Judy Ione Manor 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/17/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/17/2018Reply brief filed 
08/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/18/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/10/2018Case ready to be set 
07/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/07/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/26/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
04/19/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/22/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/20/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/15/2018Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/14/2018Motion for emergency relief filed 
02/14/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Manor, Judy IoneAppelleeMichelle May O'Neil
Michael D. Wysocki
Manor, GeorgeAppellantDwight A. Heard
Frank Gilstrap
Trial Court Information
415th District Court 
Parker 
Honorable Roy Graham Quisenberry 
CV15-1444 
Court Reporter, 415th District Court, Parker County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site