Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00055-CV    
02-18-00055-CV
02/09/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Bank of America, N.A. 
Cristella Lerma a/k/a Cristella D. Lerma a/k/a Cristela D. Lerma 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/08/2018Case ready to be set 
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/16/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/03/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/07/2018Parties cannot agree on mediator 
03/05/2018Letter filed 
02/21/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
02/19/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/09/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lerma, CristellaAppelleeShaun Brown
Michael Weston
Bank of America, N.A.AppellantSaren Williams
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable James Michael Hrabal 
2016-005652-3 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 3 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site