Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00053-CV    
02-18-00053-CV
02/09/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
J. Curt Lucas and Invenias Partners LLC 
Cyndi Ramirez Ryan  
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/04/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/04/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
09/19/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
08/15/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
07/16/2018Case ready to be set 
07/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/13/2018Letter received 
03/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/16/2018Letter received 
02/09/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mas Talent, LLCAppellee 
Lucas, J. CurtAppellantJames Doyle III
Ryan, Cyndi RamirezAppelleeBrittney A. McClinton
Invenias Partners, LLCAppellantJames Doyle III
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2 
Denton 
Honorable Robert Ramirez 
CV-2016-02101 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 2, Denton County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site