Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00049-CV    
02-18-00049-CV
02/07/2018
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of L.K. and O.K., Children 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/31/2018Case ready to be set 
07/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/30/2018Certification of word count compliance filed 
06/28/2018Certification of word count compliance requested 
06/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/2018Letter filed 
06/05/2018Letter issued by the court 
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/21/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/09/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/01/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/26/2018Letter received 
04/23/2018Notice of appeal received 
04/23/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
04/05/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/26/2018Motion for emergency relief disposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/2018Motion for emergency relief filed 
03/19/2018Letter received 
03/06/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/07/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
K., D.AppelleeJoseph F. Zellmer
K., M.AppelleeJoseph F. Zellmer
K., K.AppellantPaul W. Enlow
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
14-09269-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site