Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00044-CV    
02-18-00044-CV
02/02/2018
Juvenile
In the Matter of M.N. 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/22/2018Case ready to be set 
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/20/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/14/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/09/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
N., M.AppellantRichard A. Gladstone
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-105773-17 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site