Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00042-CR    
02-18-00042-CR
02/01/2018
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Ladarion Deshayne Cummings 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
08/23/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
08/22/2018Submitted 
08/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
07/24/2018Case ready to be set 
07/23/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/05/2018Letter received 
05/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/23/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/01/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018StatusPetition for discretionary review due in Court of Criminal Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Victoria Ford
Cummings, Ladarion DeshayneCriminal - AppellantBarry G. Johnson
Ladarion Deshayne Cummings
Trial Court Information
297th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David C. Hagerman 
1414583D 
Court Reporter, 297th District Court 
20 Yrs IDTDCJ, $1,000 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site