Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00039-CV    
02-18-00039-CV
01/30/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Richard Powell and Vickie Powell 
Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial Services, and Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, not Individually but as Trustee for Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-R 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/06/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/06/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/25/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
06/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/30/2018Case ready to be set 
05/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/14/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/12/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/12/2018Letter received 
02/12/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/12/2018Reporters record due 
02/01/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
01/30/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/06/2018StatusReply brief due
09/11/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB d/b/a Christiana Trust, not Individually but as Trustee for Ventures Trust 2013-I-H-RAppelleeCrystal G. Roach
Powell, RichardAppellantJ. B. Peacock, Jr.
Powell, VickieAppellantJ. B. Peacock, Jr.
Servis One, Inc. d/b/a BSI Financial ServicesAppelleeCrystal G. Roach
Trial Court Information
Probate Court 
Denton 
Honorable Bonnie J. Robison 
PR-2016-00610 
Court Reporter, Probate Court, Denton County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site