Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00039-CR    
02-18-00039-CR
01/30/2018
Theft
Vincent Gage Santoro 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/15/2018Case ready to be set 
05/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/19/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/20/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
03/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/05/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/30/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Shelby White
Santoro, Vincent GageCriminal - AppellantEric Labovitz
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez 
1450354D 
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court  
2 Years State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site