Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00036-CV    
02-18-00036-CV
01/29/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Lester J. Strait; Kenneth Taylor and Shannon Taylor, individually as Assignees of Lester J. Strait 
Savannah Court Partnership; PSJ Properties, LTD.; V. Patrick Gray Custom Homes, Inc.; Home Creek, L.L.C.; JMJ Torian Properties L.L.C.; Cheatham Partners; Michael P. and Sarah Neustadt; James D. and Vivian S. Collier; Hatwater, L.L.C.; Gazim Idoski; et al 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/24/2018Reply brief filedAppellee
08/20/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2018Submitted 
10/02/2018Oral argument exhibits filed 
09/26/2018Appearance of counsel 
09/26/2018Waiver 
09/25/2018Waiver 
09/25/2018Letter received 
09/24/2018Reply brief filed 
09/24/2018Letter received 
08/20/2018Reply brief filed 
07/17/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
07/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/06/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/03/2018Case ready to be set 
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/29/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/14/2018Letter issued by the court 
06/13/2018Letter filed 
06/11/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
06/11/2018Notice of late brief 
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/23/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/23/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/15/2018Appearance of counsel 
04/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/23/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/09/2018Appearance of counsel 
02/28/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
02/27/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/01/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/01/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/29/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
PSJ Properties, LTD.AppelleeJeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
David S. Stubblefield
Cheatham PartnersAppelleeJeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
David S. Stubblefield
V. Patrick Gray Customer Homes, Inc.AppelleeJeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
David S. Stubblefield
Idoski, GazimAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Providence BankAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Abraham, TinkuAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Hatwater, L.L.C.AppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Ruckel, Sean M.AppelleePerry J. Cockerell
JMJ Torian Properties, L.L.C.AppelleeAdam R. Barela
David S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Strait, Lester J.AppellantRussell R. Barton
Blair L. Park
Andrew D. Sims
Atwood Custom Homes, Inc.AppelleeAdam R. Barela
David S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Stephen Polozola
Home Creek, L.L.C.AppelleeDavid S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
First National BankAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Taylor, KennethAppellantAndrew D. Sims
Russell R. Barton
Blair L. Park
Taylor, ShannonAppellantAndrew D. Sims
Blair L. Park
Russell R. Barton
Abraham, AshaAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Yelverton, ShanaAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
Neustadt, SarahAppelleeDavid S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
Neustadt, Michael P.AppelleeDavid S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
PlainsCapital BankAppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Savannah Court PartnershipAppelleeDavid S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
Joseph F. Cleveland Jr.
Ruckel, Lena H.AppelleePerry J. Cockerell
Hill, LauraAppelleeVictoria W. Thomas
City Of SouthlakeAppellee 
Collier, Vivian S.AppelleeJeffrey Cook
David S. Stubblefield
Adam R. Barela
Collier, James D.AppelleeDavid S. Stubblefield
Jeffrey Cook
Adam R. Barela
Trial Court Information
342nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable J. Wade Birdwell 
342-281936-15 
Court Reporter, 342nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site