Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00034-CV    
02-18-00034-CV
01/24/2018
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of J.B., A Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/07/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/07/2018Case ready to be set 
05/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/12/2018Amended notice of appeal filed 
03/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/01/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/27/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/27/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/20/2018Appearance of counsel 
02/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/09/2018Docketing statement filed 
02/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/06/2018Order received from trial court 
02/05/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/25/2018Amended notice of appeal filed 
01/24/2018Case began in court of appeals 
01/24/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/01/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJames D. Saint
Rebecca L. Safavi
B., J.Civil - Ad LitemVicki L. Foster
M., D.AppellantJoshua R. Brinkley
Trial Court Information
235th District Court 
Cooke 
Honorable Janelle M. Haverkamp 
CV16-00427 
Court Reporter, 235th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site