Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00031-CV    
02-18-00031-CV
01/23/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
Birchman Baptist Church 
Scarlette Rafferty Elliott, as the Personal Representative of the Estate of Sean Christian Rafferty, Scarlette Rafferty Elliott, Individually, and Sean Paul Rafferty, Individually 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/24/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/17/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/25/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/24/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
05/14/2018Letter received 
05/11/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
05/07/2018Letter received 
05/07/2018Case ready to be set 
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/05/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/26/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/26/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/23/2018Extension of time to file clerks record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/23/2018Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/2018Extension of time to file clerks record filed 
02/20/2018Mediation objection filed 
02/20/2018Mediation objection filed 
01/31/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
01/31/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/31/2018Amended notice of appeal filed 
01/23/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Elliott, Scarlette RaffertyAppelleeWilliam J. Brotherton
Birchman Baptist ChurchAppellantRandall L. Schmidt
Elliott, Scarlette RaffertyAppelleeWilliam J. Brotherton
Rafferty, Sean PaulAppelleeWilliam J. Brotherton
Trial Court Information
393rd District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Douglas M. Robison 
14-10277-393 
Court Reporter, 393rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site