Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00031-CR    
02-18-00031-CR
01/29/2018
Sexual Assault
John Micheal McBride 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
07/24/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/17/2018Case ready to be set 
07/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/06/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/01/2018Clerks record filed 
02/08/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/29/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasDee Peavy
Constance K. Hall
McBride, John MichealCriminal - AppellantCora L. Moore
Trial Court Information
90th District Court 
Young 
Honorable Stephen E. Bristow 
10678 
Court Reporter, 90th District Court 
15 Yrs IDTDCJ 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site