Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00029-CV    
02-18-00029-CV
01/19/2018
Suit affecting parent child relationship
In the Interest of J.C., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/28/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/26/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/17/2018Case ready to be set 
09/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
09/11/2018Notice received 
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/17/2018Letter received 
07/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
04/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/20/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
04/04/2018Appearance of counsel 
02/19/2018Letter received 
01/19/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/19/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/19/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
C., I.AppelleePaul M. Leopold
A., P.AppellantThomas M. Michel
C., K.AppelleePaul M. Leopold
Trial Court Information
324th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jerome S. Hennigan 
324-577171-15 
Court Reporter, 324th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site