Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00027-CV    
02-18-00027-CV
01/18/2018
Personal Injury
Misty Jackson, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Roger J. Young, Deceased; and Roger Jackson 
Kindred Hospitals Limited Partnership d/b/a Kindred Hospital Fort Worth 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/28/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
05/11/2018Appendix filedAppellant
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/18/2018Submitted 
09/11/2018Letter received 
09/11/2018Letter received 
09/11/2018Appearance of counsel 
06/28/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
06/26/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/08/2018Case ready to be set 
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/11/2018Appendix filed 
05/09/2018Corrected brief requested 
05/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/26/2018No reporters record filed in civil case 
03/21/2018Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record 
02/28/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/13/2018Objection to mediation disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/2018Mediation objection filed 
02/08/2018Response filed 
01/29/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
01/29/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/25/2018Fee paid 
01/18/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jackson, MistyAppellantPatrick W. Powers
Kindred Hospitals Limited PartnershipAppelleeFrank Alvarez
Christina Gratke Nason
Jackson, RogerAppellantPatrick W. Powers
Trial Court Information
141st District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable John P. Chupp 
141-297189-18 
Court Reporter, 141st District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site