Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00026-CR    
02-18-00026-CR
01/25/2018
Assault
Michael Raymond Riojas, Jr. aka Michael R. Riojas, Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/05/2018Letter received 
09/19/2018Mandate issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
07/26/2018Memorandum opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
07/23/2018Submitted 
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/19/2018Letter received 
05/25/2018Case ready to be set 
05/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/23/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/21/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/25/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/19/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Victoria Ford
Riojas, Junior, Michael Raymond aka Michael R. Riojas, Jr.Criminal - AppellantAaron C. "Clay" Graham
Michael Raymond aka Michael R. Riojas, Jr. Riojas Junior
Trial Court Information
372nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable David Scott Wisch 
1492292D 
Court Reporter, 372nd District Court 
25 Yrs. IDTDCJ $999.95 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site