Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00025-CV    
02-18-00025-CV
01/16/2018
Special Appearance
BBB Industries, LLC 
Cardone Industries, Inc. 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/19/2018Post submission brief receivedAppellee
06/01/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
03/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Post submission brief received 
09/19/2018Motion for leave filed 
09/11/2018Submitted 
09/11/2018Oral argument exhibits filed 
09/11/2018Oral argument exhibits filed 
07/31/2018Letter received 
07/26/2018Letter received 
07/20/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
07/03/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/01/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
05/29/2018Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/2018Motion to supplement record filed 
05/11/2018Telephone call received 
05/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/09/2018Telephone call received 
05/09/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
05/09/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
05/09/2018Case ready to be set 
05/08/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
05/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/25/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/24/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/22/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/20/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/16/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
02/27/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/23/2018Motion to appear pro hac vice disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/2018Motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
02/19/2018Motion in support of motion to appear pro hac vice filed 
01/31/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/16/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/16/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/16/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmittedSubmitted on oral argument
09/19/2018MotionMotion to file post submission brief
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BBB Industries, LLC.AppellantDavid E. Keltner
Jason C. Nash
Kelsi Corkran
Cardone Industries, Inc.AppelleeM. Kevin Queenan
Thomas W. Sankey
Evan Young
Thomas R. Phillips
Richard P. Hogan Jr.
Trial Court Information
17th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Melody Wilkinson 
017-271617-14 
Court Reporter, 17th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site