Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00021-CV    
02-18-00021-CV
01/12/2018
Real Property
South Texas Innovations, LLC d/b/a STI, LLC 
Rise Residential Construction, LP, GCRE/TX Main MF, LLC, and LCAR Park View, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
04/06/2018Appendix filedAppellant
03/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/06/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
05/18/2018Motion to postpone oral argument disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/16/2018Motion to postpone oral argument filed 
05/16/2018Appearance of counsel 
05/01/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
04/26/2018Case ready to be set 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/25/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/06/2018Appendix filed 
03/27/2018Corrected brief requested 
03/26/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
03/13/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/07/2018Fee paid 
02/08/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/31/2018Deadline for parties to select mediator 
01/31/2018Notice of late filing fee 
01/31/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/24/2018Notification received that no record was taken 
01/12/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/18/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Rise Residential Construction, LPAppelleeDavid Surratt
South Texas Innovations, LLC d/b/a STI, LLCAppellantDamian W. Abreo
Millard Johnson
C. Patrick Waites
LCAR Park View, LLCAppelleeC. John Scheef III
GCRE/TX Main MF, LLCAppelleeC. John Scheef III
Trial Court Information
211th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Brody Young Shanklin 
17-5219-211 
Court Reporter, 211th District Court, Denton County 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site