Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00019-CV    
02-18-00019-CV
01/12/2018
Miscellaneous/other civil
In re: the Commitment of Gregory A. Jones 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/08/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/08/2018Reply brief filed 
10/03/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
09/28/2018Case ready to be set 
09/28/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
08/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/30/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/03/2018Appearance of counsel 
07/02/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
06/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
05/02/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
03/12/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/01/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/26/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/25/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/12/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/06/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasAppelleeMelinda Fletcher
Meredith L. Kennedy
Joseph W. Spence
Jones, Gregory A.AppellantJohn C. Moncure
Trial Court Information
89th District Court 
Wichita 
Honorable Charles M. Barnard 
185,786-C 
Court Reporter, 89th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site