Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00019-CR    
02-18-00019-CR
01/23/2018
Appeal From a Pretrial Order
The State of Texas 
Raul Cortez 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
06/05/2018Case ready to be set 
06/04/2018Letter filed 
05/16/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/17/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/09/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
02/01/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/23/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/11/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Cortez, RaulAppelleeSteve Gebhardt
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
Steven Baker
Trial Court Information
213th District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Louis E. Sturns 
1470860D 
Court Reporter, 213th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site