Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00006-CV    
02-18-00006-CV
01/02/2018
Divorce
Jessey Chi Hua Lee AND JoAnderson Capital, LLC., Jim K. Lee, and Chen L. "Jenny" Lee 
Crystal Linh Hoang Lee  
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
07/17/2018Reply brief filedAppellant
07/12/2018Brief was not filedAppellee
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/19/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/02/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
07/17/2018Reply brief filed 
07/12/2018Case ready to be set 
07/12/2018Brief was not filed 
07/09/2018Letter filed 
07/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/05/2018Notice of late brief 
07/03/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
06/14/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/13/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/11/2018Corrected brief requested 
05/23/2018Corrected brief requested 
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
05/21/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
04/10/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
03/06/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/05/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/19/2018Letter received 
02/08/2018Letter received 
02/05/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/02/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
02/02/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/08/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/08/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/03/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
01/02/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/02/2018Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
01/02/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lee, Jessey Chi HuaAppellantThomas M. Michel
Lee, Chen L. "Jenny"AppellantJohn M. (Jack) Kuykendall
Lee, Crystal Linh HoangAppelleeCrystal Linh Hoang Lee
Lee, Jim K.AppellantJohn M. (Jack) Kuykendall
JoAnderson Capital, LLCAppellantJohn M. (Jack) Kuykendall
Trial Court Information
367th District Court 
Denton 
Honorable Margaret Barnes 
15-04017-367 
Court Reporter, 367th District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site