Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00003-CR    
02-18-00003-CR
01/05/2018
Burglary of a Habitation
Daizjion Deveil Demerson 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
05/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/02/2018Set for submission on briefs 
06/11/2018Case ready to be set 
06/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
05/22/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/23/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/19/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/10/2018Docketing statement filed 
01/05/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasJoseph W. Spence
John E. Meskunas
Demerson, Daizjion DeveilCriminal - AppellantSteven Richard Miears
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3 
Tarrant 
Honorable Robb Catalano 
1395518D 
Court Reporter, Criminal District Court No. 3 
10 Yrs IDTDCJ, $188 Fine 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site