Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-18-00001-CR    
02-18-00001-CR
01/03/2018
Theft Under $1500
Jacob Wylie Romine Jr. 
The State of Texas 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/29/2018Brief was not filedState
02/21/2018Anders brief filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
09/24/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
08/29/2018Case ready to be set 
08/29/2018Brief was not filed 
07/18/2018Response was not filed 
04/24/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/24/2018Telephone inquiry to or from the court 
04/10/2018Letter filed 
04/09/2018Motion to access appellate record dispMotion or Writ Granted
04/09/2018Motion to access appellate record filed 
03/23/2018Letter issued by the court 
03/22/2018Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
03/21/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/21/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/21/2018Anders brief filed 
02/20/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
02/14/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/12/2018Trial court certification filed 
01/05/2018Notice of no right to appeal 
01/03/2018Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/2018MotionMotion to withdraw as attorney
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Romine, Jr., Jacob WylieCriminal - AppellantJacob Wylie Romine, Jr.
Angie M. Hadley
The State of TexasCriminal - AppellantRobert T. Christian
Trial Court Information
355th District Court 
Hood 
Honorable Ralph H. Walton, 
CR13025 
Court Reporter, 355th District Court 
24 Months State Jail 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site