Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00469-CV    
02-17-00469-CV
12/29/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Bryan P. Bernard 
Doris W. Bernard 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/03/2018Case ready to be set 
05/03/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/29/2018Appearance of counsel 
03/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
03/02/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/01/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/31/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/24/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/08/2018Docketing statement filed 
12/29/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/22/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bernard, Bryan P.AppellantAdam D. Chilton
Michael L. Forman
Bernard, Doris W.AppelleeJon Michael Franks
Jefferson R. Branch
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable William W. Harris 
233-571359-15 
Court Reporter, 233rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site