Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00465-CV    
02-17-00465-CV
12/28/2017
Real Property
Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a Bank of New York as Trustee for the Certificate Holders of CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2006-10 
NSL Property Holdings, LLC 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/14/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
04/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/20/2018Appendix filedAppellant
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/22/2018Submitted 
06/01/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/14/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
04/09/2018Case ready to be set 
04/07/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
03/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/20/2018Appendix filed 
02/15/2018Corrected brief requested 
02/15/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
01/17/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
01/03/2018Fee paid 
01/03/2018Letter received 
01/02/2018Notification received that no record was taken 
12/28/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/28/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/22/2018SubmittedSubmitted on briefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bank of New York MellonAppellantBrenda A. Hard-Wilson
B. David L. Foster
NSL Property Holdings, LLCAppelleeKenneth S. Harter
Trial Court Information
352nd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Mark T. Pittman 
352-291732-17 
Court Reporter, 352nd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site