Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00463-CV    
02-17-00463-CV
12/27/2017
Miscellaneous/other civil
Latter and Blum of Texas, LLC d/b/a Realty Associates 
Paul Murphy 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
08/23/2018Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
08/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/23/2018Electronic reply brief filed 
08/22/2018Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied 
08/15/2018Letter received 
08/09/2018Case ready to be set 
08/08/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
07/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
06/27/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/26/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
06/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/11/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
05/15/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
05/10/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/09/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
04/11/2018Docketing statement filed 
04/10/2018Fee requested 
04/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
04/10/2018Case reinstated 
03/15/2018Order issuedAbated
02/08/2018Response filed 
01/30/2018Letter issued by the court 
01/08/2018Response filed 
01/02/2018Appellant notified that notice of appeal late/show grounds to continue 
12/27/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/23/2018SubmissionBriefs
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Latter and Blum of Texas, LLCAppellantTom C. Sanders
Murphy, PaulAppelleePaul C. (Pat) Murphy IV
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2 
Tarrant 
Honorable Jennifer A. Rymell 
2016-000685-2 
Court Reporter, County Court At Law No. 2 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site