Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00451-CV    
02-17-00451-CV
12/20/2017
Challenge inability to afford costs
Anthony Alcedo 
Janet Alcedo 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
07/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/25/2018Assignment of visiting judge 
09/25/2018Set for submission on oral argument 
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed 
09/11/2018Notice received 
09/05/2018Case ready to be set 
09/04/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/02/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
07/05/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested 
06/04/2018Order entered 
06/04/2018Case reinstated 
04/26/2018Order issuedAbated
04/26/2018Motion to abate appeal disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/18/2018Motion to abate appeal filed 
03/21/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/19/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
02/19/2018Letter received 
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/05/2018Motion for extension of time to file brief filed 
01/29/2018Record checked out 
01/23/2018Appearance of counsel 
01/19/2018Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/18/2018Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/16/2018Extension of time to file reporters record filed 
01/11/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/20/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
12/15/2017Additional copies of documents received after initial filing 
12/15/2017Docketing statement filed 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/24/2018StatusReply brief due
10/30/2018SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Alcedo, JanetAppelleeJennifer Wiggins Moore
Paul M. Leopold
Jessica Hall Janicek
Alcedo, AnthonyAppellantThomas M. Michel
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable William W. Harris 
233-591171-16 
Court Reporter, 233rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site