Second Court of Appeals

Case: 02-17-00436-CV    
02-17-00436-CV
12/05/2017
Termination of parental rights or conservatorship - accelerated
In the Interest of A.R., a Child 
 
No 
 
 
 
 
 
West Publishing 
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/07/2018Anders brief filedAnders
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/2018Mandate issuedAffirmed
08/09/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
06/20/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/12/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
06/07/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/30/2018Motion for extension of time to file motion for rehearing filed 
05/24/2018Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/2018Submitted 
05/16/2018Motion for extension of time to file response disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/2018Motion for extension of time to file response filed 
05/08/2018Set for submission on briefs 
05/07/2018Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
05/03/2018Letter issued by the court 
05/02/2018Document filed 
04/25/2018Order enteredAbated
04/25/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/24/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
04/18/2018Letter filed 
04/17/2018Letter issued by the court 
04/17/2018Supplemental reporters record due 
04/12/2018Letter filed 
04/12/2018Certificate of service filed 
04/12/2018Corrected entry made by clerks office 
04/12/2018Case ready to be set 
04/09/2018Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested 
04/09/2018Response filed 
04/02/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
03/20/2018Response filed 
03/01/2018Letter issued by the court 
02/22/2018Response filed 
02/07/2018Motion for leave disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/07/2018Anders brief filed 
02/06/2018Letter filed 
02/05/2018Motion for leave filed 
01/31/2018Notice of late brief 
01/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
01/10/2018Case reinstated 
01/10/2018Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed 
01/09/2018Order received from trial court 
12/28/2017Letter issued by the court 
12/28/2017Objection filed 
12/27/2017Order issuedAbated
12/27/2017Motion to withdraw attorney disposedRemanded to Trial Court
12/22/2017Docketing statement filed 
12/20/2017Motion to withdraw attorney filed 
12/13/2017Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed 
12/13/2017Electronic Clerks Record Filed 
12/05/2017Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals 
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/20/2018Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R., K. AppellantK. R.
Frank Adler
Texas Department of Family and Protective ServicesAppelleeJoseph W. Spence
R., A.Civil - Ad LitemRay Hall
Trial Court Information
323rd District Court 
Tarrant 
Honorable Timothy A. Menikos 
323-104047-16 
Court Reporter, 323rd District Court 
 

To view or print PDF files you must have the Adobe Acrobat® reader. This software may be obtained without charge from Adobe. Download the reader from the Adobe Web site